Aikaterini Bokou
Geen lopende functies
Loopbaan van Aikaterini Bokou
Eerdere bekende functies van Aikaterini Bokou
Bedrijven | Functie | Begin | Einde |
---|---|---|---|
ELVICTOR GROUP, INC. | Financieel Directeur/CFO | 25-05-2021 | 03-01-2023 |
MINERVA BUNKERING | Corporate Officer/Principal | 01-01-2007 | 01-01-2019 |
Ernst & Young Finance SA | Comptroller/Controller/Auditor | - | - |
Opleiding van Aikaterini Bokou
The University of Reading | Graduate Degree |
National & Kapodistrian University of Athens | Undergraduate Degree |
Statistieken
Internationaal
Griekenland | 4 |
Zwitserland | 2 |
Verenigd Koninkrijk | 2 |
Operationeel
Director of Finance/CFO | 1 |
Comptroller/Controller/Auditor | 1 |
Corporate Officer/Principal | 1 |
Sectoraal
Consumer Services | 3 |
Commercial Services | 2 |
Distribution Services | 2 |
Beklede functies
Actief
Inactief
Beursgenoteerde bedrijven
Bedrijven in privébezit
Verwante bedrijven
Beursgenoteerde bedrijven | 1 |
---|---|
ELVICTOR GROUP, INC. | Commercial Services |
Bedrijven in privébezit | 2 |
---|---|
Ernst & Young Finance SA | |
Minerva Bunkering
Minerva Bunkering Wholesale DistributorsDistribution Services Minerva Bunkering supplies and markets refined marine fuel and lubricants. Its services are provided to all type of vessels, including container ships, dry bulk carriers, cruise ships, oil tankers and ferries. The company was founded by Dimitris Melissanidis on June 6, 2005 and is headquartered in Switzerland. | Distribution Services |
- Beurs
- Insiders
- Aikaterini Bokou
- Ervaring